Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2020 at 12:59:57 (UTC).

NADINE SHASHATY VS SAN FERNANDO HOSPITAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 NADINE SHASHATY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against SAN FERNANDO HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0644

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHASHATY NADINE

DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BERMUDEZ LOU AKA PRACTICE SALES AND APPRAISALS

SAN FERNANDO HOSPITAL AKA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

SHASHATY NADINE M.D.

SAN FERNANDO HOSPITAL

Cross Defendant

SHASHATY M.D. NADINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BIOTEAU ROCHELLE

KATZMAN HARVEY L.

CHENEY BRENT G

CHENEY BRENT

LEIVA MARLENE

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

CHENEY BRENT

 

Court Documents

Answer

10/26/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS F...)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS F...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 03/06/2020

3/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 03/06/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/20/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/3/2019: Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF THE PARTIES TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES; PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

12/10/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF THE PARTIES TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES; PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

Case Management Statement

11/5/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

10/22/2019: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

10/8/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

10/8/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

9/30/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Cross-Complaint

8/14/2019: Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Case Management Statement

9/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/8/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Upcoming Case Management Conference and Leave for Defendant to file First Amended Answer to Unverified First Amended Complaint); Filed by DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions for plaintiff) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions f...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions for plaintiff) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference and Order to Show Cause); Filed by NADINE SHASHATY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deanco Healthcare Realty, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DEANCO HEALTHCARE REALTY, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NADINE SHASHATY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NADINE SHASHATY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NADINE SHASHATY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHENEY BRENT