This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 17:20:01 (UTC).

NADIA ELFOURARI VS CITY OF SANTA MONICA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 NADIA ELFOURARI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA MONICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3836

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELFOURARI NADIA

Defendants

CITY OF CULVER CITY

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KWON MICHAEL W.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/14/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

9/14/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2024
  • Hearing09/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • Hearing03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nadia Elfourari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nadia Elfourari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nadia Elfourari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Nadia Elfourari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nadia Elfourari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF CULVER CITY A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA MONICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KWON MICHAEL W.