This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2022 at 16:17:50 (UTC).

NADEREH KANGAVARI, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 NADEREH KANGAVARI, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8043

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANGAVARI AN INDIVIDUAL NADEREH

Defendants

CEDARS SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM

CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARUSO MARY L.

Defendant Attorney

CHERMELA JASON

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/29/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/29/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/29/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/17/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/17/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2024
  • Hearing08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant); As to: NADEREH KANGAVARI, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: NADEREH KANGAVARI, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant); Service Date: 09/15/2022; Service Cost: 117.18; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: NADEREH KANGAVARI, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); Service Date: 09/15/2022; Service Cost: 117.18; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NADEREH KANGAVARI, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NADEREH KANGAVARI, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NADEREH KANGAVARI, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARUSO MARY LEE