This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 23:59:53 (UTC).

MYRNA DELGADILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS LEANNA VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MYRNA DELGADILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEANNA VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2603

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DELGADILLO MYRNA

DELGADILLO ROCHELLE

AUDREY ORTEGA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ROCHELLE DELGADILLO

Defendants

VENTURA LEANNA

VENTURA FRANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

WELLS MICHELLE

DESALERNOS STEFANIE CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

2/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR

9/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

8/26/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

8/26/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/31/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

6/2/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/2/2020: Answer

PI General Order

1/28/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AUDREY

1/29/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AUDREY

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/22/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Hearing07/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Hearing07/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Handling Attorney); Filed by LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (MOTION TO COMPEL DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Motion to Compel Off Calendar); Filed by LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Special Interrogatories); Filed by LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Demand for Production of Documents); Filed by LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MYRNA DELGADILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MYRNA DELGADILLO (Plaintiff); ROCHELLE DELGADILLO (Plaintiff); AUDREY ORTEGA, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem Rochelle Delgadillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MYRNA DELGADILLO (Plaintiff); ROCHELLE DELGADILLO (Plaintiff); AUDREY ORTEGA, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem Rochelle Delgadillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Audrey); Filed by MYRNA DELGADILLO (Plaintiff); ROCHELLE DELGADILLO (Plaintiff); AUDREY ORTEGA, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem Rochelle Delgadillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MYRNA DELGADILLO (Plaintiff); ROCHELLE DELGADILLO (Plaintiff); AUDREY ORTEGA, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem Rochelle Delgadillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MYRNA DELGADILLO (Plaintiff); ROCHELLE DELGADILLO (Plaintiff); AUDREY ORTEGA, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem Rochelle Delgadillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DESALERNOS STEFANIE CHRISTINE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS MICHELLE