This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 00:13:51 (UTC).

MYRIAM PINZON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 MYRIAM PINZON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7699

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINZON AN INDIVIDUAL MYRIAM

Defendant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINE EDWARD S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/14/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Request for Dismissal

9/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MYRIAM PINZON, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MYRIAM PINZON, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MYRIAM PINZON, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MYRIAM PINZON, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINE EDWARD S.