Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 22:53:23 (UTC).

MYRA CRUSE VS L.A. ARENA COMPANY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 MYRA CRUSE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against L A ARENA COMPANY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8398

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUSE MYRA

Defendants

L.A. LIVE PROPERTIES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

L.A. ARENA COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LA LIVE THEATER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FUND CATHRYN

FUND CATHRYN G.

Defendant Attorney

HAZANY CATHERINE LOUISE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES MYRA CRUSE

11/10/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES MYRA CRUSE

Case Management Statement

11/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

11/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

9/24/2020: Answer

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS L.A. LIVE PROPERTIES, LLC AND LA LIVE THEATRE, LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/24/2020: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS L.A. LIVE PROPERTIES, LLC AND LA LIVE THEATRE, LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/28/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • Hearing05/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by L.A. ARENA COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); L.A. LIVE PROPERTIES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); LA Live Theater, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by L.A. ARENA COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); L.A. LIVE PROPERTIES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); LA Live Theater, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Myra Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (Myra Cruse); Filed by Myra Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Myra Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by L.A. ARENA COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer (DEFENDANTS L.A. LIVE PROPERTIES, LLC AND LA LIVE THEATRE, LLC?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT); Filed by L.A. LIVE PROPERTIES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); LA Live Theater, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Myra Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Myra Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Myra Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Myra Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Myra Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Myra Cruse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA ARENA COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where LA LIVE THEATRE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LA LIVE PROPERTIES A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAZANY CATHERINE LOUISE