This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2020 at 08:50:46 (UTC).

MYNOR ORELLANA ET AL VS AKOP SUPIKYAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 MYNOR ORELLANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AKOP SUPIKYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0107

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SAGASTUME ABEL

ORELLANA MYNOR

Defendants and Respondents

CHAKALYAN ADELINA

SUPIKYAN AKOP

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CONTRERAS RAUL C. ESQ.

TABONE DEREK LEONARD

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SPRIGGS SCOTT B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

2/26/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

2/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Declaration - DECLARATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

2/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EXPERTS

1/28/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EXPERTS

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL EXPERTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

1/22/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL EXPERTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/1/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Witness List

9/20/2019: Witness List

Statement of the Case

9/20/2019: Statement of the Case

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE #2

8/29/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE #2

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE #11

8/29/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE #11

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE #4

8/29/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE #4

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED) OF 08/23/2019

8/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED) OF 08/23/2019

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

9/5/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Notice of Deposit - Jury -

8/10/2018: Notice of Deposit - Jury -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/21/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS -

1/12/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

1/12/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mynor Orellana (Plaintiff); Abel Sagastume (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docketat 3:50 PM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 02/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Mynor Orellana (Plaintiff); Abel Sagastume (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions against counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions against counsel for Plainti...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Order to Show Cause); Filed by Mynor Orellana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mynor Orellana (Plaintiff); Abel Sagastume (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mynor Orellana (Plaintiff); Abel Sagastume (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mynor Orellana (Plaintiff); Abel Sagastume (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690107    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL EXPERT DEPOSITIONS

On October 23, 2019, the Court continued the trial date from November 4, 2019 to January 27, 2020 to allow a mandatory settlement conference to take place.  The Court did not continue the discovery cutoff dates.  Therefore the time for expert discovery and discovery motions ended in October 2019.  On January 27, 2020, the Court continued the trial date to January 29, 2020 because the parties were not ready for trial.  The Court noted that discovery had closed.  On January 29, 2020, the Court continued the trial to Feb. 14, 2020.  The Court did not reopen discovery with any of these continuances.  Therefore, Plaintiff's motion to compel the deposition of Defendants' experts is DENIED because expert discovery has closed and the time for discovery motions has expired. 

The moving party is to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@Llacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.