This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 19:51:23 (UTC).

MYNOR DAVID JIMENEZ VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRAN

Case Summary

On 02/15/2017 MYNOR DAVID JIMENEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0741

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JIMENEZ MYNOR DAVID

Defendants and Respondents

DOE BUS DRIVER

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPLOLITAN

DOES 1 TO 100

ROSEMARY WITHERS DOE1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WAINFELD GABRIEL H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA

9/12/2018: NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA

NOTICE TO PRODUCE AND LODGE AT TIME OF TRIAL

9/12/2018: NOTICE TO PRODUCE AND LODGE AT TIME OF TRIAL

Ex Parte Application

11/21/2018: Ex Parte Application

Order

11/21/2018: Order

Minute Order

11/21/2018: Minute Order

Motion to Compel

2/21/2019: Motion to Compel

Minute Order

3/20/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/20/2019: Notice

Order

4/19/2019: Order

Minute Order

4/30/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/5/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES BASED ON 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

2/13/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES BASED ON 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESSES

4/7/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESSES

4/7/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESSES

Minute Order

6/27/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON METRO'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/29/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON METRO'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition

8/23/2017: Opposition

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

10/27/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (and Hearing on Motion to Compel Defense Medical Examination of Plaintiff (While in Federal Custody)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference and Hearing on Motion to Compel Defe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Notice (of Continuance of Hearing/Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Los Angeles County Metroplolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Defense Medical Examination of Plaintiff) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Defense Medical Examination of Pl...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles County Metroplolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Defense Medical Examination of Plaintiff) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Order (By the Court requiring Attorneys to Personally Appear at Hearing Prepared to Address Specified Issues); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Los Angeles County Metroplolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Los Angeles County Metroplolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metroplolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • METRO'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mynor David Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Mynor David Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES BASED ON 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC650741    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MYNOR DAVID JIMENEZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC650741

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 18, 2019

Defendant propounded form interrogatories, set two and RFAs, set one on Plaintiff on 9/11/19. To date, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding interrogatories, deeming the RFAs admitted, and imposing sanctions.

Defendant’s motion to compel is granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, set two, without objections, within ten days. CCP §§2030.290(a),(b).

Defendant’s motion to deem RFAs, set one admitted is also granted. CCP §2033.280(b).

Sanctions are mandatory. §§2030.290(c), 2033.280(c). Defendant seeks sanctions in the amounts of $720 (RFAs) and $180 (interrogatories). The amounts are reasonable and fully supported by Defense Counsel’s declaration. The request for sanctions is granted in full.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiff and his attorney of record, jointly and severally; they are ordered to pay sanctions to Defendant, by and through its attorney of record, in the total amount of $900, within twenty days.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Case Number: BC650741    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MYNOR DAVID JIMENEZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC650741

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL IME WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 15, 2019

Defendant has noticed Plaintiff’s IME on several occasions, and Plaintiff has not appeared. Defendant moves to compel Plaintiff to attend an IME. The hearing on this motion has been continued multiple times due to the fact that Plaintiff has been in ICE custody. Plaintiff has now been deported to Guatemala, and the parties have briefed the issue of compelling the IME.

Pursuant to CCP §2032.320(e):

(e) If the place of the examination is more than 75 miles from the residence of the person to be examined, an order to submit to it shall be entered only if both of the following conditions are satisfied:

(1) The court determines that there is good cause for the travel involved.

(2) The order is conditioned on the advancement by the moving party of the reasonable expenses and costs to the examinee for travel to the place of examination.

Defendant has not shown either of the foregoing. Indeed, the Court is concerned that travel to the United States may not be possible under the circumstances. The Court notes that Plaintiff indicates a willingness and ability to travel to Mexico to have his IME conducted there. The Court asks the parties to meet and confer in an attempt to arrange an IME in this manner (or any other manner agreeable to the parties).

The motion is denied. The ruling is without prejudice. If Defendant renews the motion, Defendant must make the required showing per §2032.320(e) in connection with compelling an IME more than 75 miles from a party’s residence.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.