This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2020 at 16:48:59 (UTC).

MYLES DAVIS, ET AL. VS JOHN ROBERT HILL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 MYLES DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOHN ROBERT HILL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3083

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DUNCAN JEREMIAH

DAVIS MYLES

Defendants

SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION

HILL JOHN ROBERT AKA JOHN GABBANA AKA BOONK GANG AKA JOHN GABBANA AKA BOONK GANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODARELLI ANTHONY CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

AMARO MICHAEL LEE

 

Court Documents

Answer

10/26/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

10/13/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/28/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

9/16/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • Hearing08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by MYLES DAVIS (Plaintiff); JEREMIAH DUNCAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MYLES DAVIS (Plaintiff); JEREMIAH DUNCAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MYLES DAVIS (Plaintiff); JEREMIAH DUNCAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MYLES DAVIS (Plaintiff); JEREMIAH DUNCAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MYLES DAVIS (Plaintiff); JEREMIAH DUNCAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMARO MICHAEL L. ESQ.