Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 11:10:52 (UTC).

MUSSERREF YUCESOY VS KAREEM NIZAM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 MUSSERREF YUCESOY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KAREEM NIZAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5236

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YUCESOY MUSSERREF

Defendants

NIZAM RANA

NIZAM KAREEM

LIDD INVESTMENT LLC

KALLA SAMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASHANI JONATHAN M

Defendant Attorneys

LISNOW ROBERT

DUCEY MITCHELL FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/28/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JONATHAN M. KASHANI ISO MTQ DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS

3/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JONATHAN M. KASHANI ISO MTQ DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT LIDD INVESTMENT, LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MITCHELL F. DUCE

4/15/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT LIDD INVESTMENT, LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MITCHELL F. DUCE

Substitution of Attorney

12/31/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

10/22/2020: Answer

Answer - ANSWER FIRST AMENDED

10/30/2020: Answer - ANSWER FIRST AMENDED

Proof of Personal Service

9/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/9/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

9/9/2020: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/9/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • Hearing07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Hearing12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Hearing04/28/2021 at 13:30 PM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANT LIDD INVESTMENT, LLC?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MITCHELL F. DUCEY; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,012.50 AGAINST PLAINTIFF); Filed by LIDD INVESTMENT LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Jonathan M. Kashani ISO MTQ Deposition Subpoenas); Filed by Musserref Yucesoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Musserref Yucesoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash (N TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO MODIFY DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,040.00 AGAINST DEFENDANTS, AND AGAINST THEIR COUNSEL); Filed by Musserref Yucesoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Musserref Yucesoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LIDD INVESTMENT LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kareem Nizam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Musserref Yucesoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Musserref Yucesoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Musserref Yucesoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Musserref Yucesoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Musserref Yucesoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASHANI JONATHAN M