This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 05:36:02 (UTC).

MUSSARAT WAHLA VS LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 MUSSARAT WAHLA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8057

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAHLA MUSSARAT

Defendants

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARIM IMRAAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/30/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Substitution of Attorney

9/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • Hearing02/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Mussarat Wahla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mussarat Wahla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mussarat Wahla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mussarat Wahla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln Benefit Life Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARIM IMRAAN