This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 21:34:01 (UTC).

MURPHY O'BRIEN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS URBAN COMMONS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 MURPHY O'BRIEN, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against URBAN COMMONS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1457

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURPHY O'BRIEN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IEZZA NICK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/1/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Murphy O'Brien, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Murphy O'Brien, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Murphy O'Brien, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MURPHY O'BRIEN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IEZZA NICK