This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2022 at 05:37:28 (UTC).

MURPHY, JOHN H. - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 MURPHY, JOHN H - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8233

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MURPHY BRIDGET C.

MURPHY JENNIFER A.

MURPHY MARION I.

PALLY ELIZABETH M.

Not Classified By Court

MURPHY JOHN H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LIEBER JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Proposed - Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value

8/23/2021: Proposed - Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value

Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value - 13200 PR Code - [mailed certified copy to litigant]

9/10/2021: Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value - 13200 PR Code - [mailed certified copy to litigant]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Real Property of Small Value - 13200 PR Code ([mailed certified copy to litigant] ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIEBER JEFFREY EDWARD