This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 06:27:54 (UTC).

MUNDY, NATHANIEL ANGUS VS MUNDY, CHRISTINE

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 MUNDY, NATHANIEL ANGUS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MUNDY, CHRISTINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7146

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MUNDY NATHANIEL ANGUS

Respondent

MUNDY CHRISTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARENS ARTHUR HUGO

Respondent Attorney

YAMAMOTO DAVID KUNIO

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

6/28/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/28/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - UCCJEA

6/28/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

6/28/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

6/28/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/28/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/29/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - Mail - Julio Bardavid; Response (FL-120) and UCCJEA

9/27/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Julio Bardavid; Response (FL-120) and UCCJEA

Proof of Service - Arthur H. Barens; Response and UCCJEA

9/27/2021: Proof of Service - Arthur H. Barens; Response and UCCJEA

Declaration - UCCJEA

9/24/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

9/24/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Julio Bardavid; Response (FL-120) and UCCJEA ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Arthur H. Barens; Response and UCCJEA ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARENS ARTHUR HUGO