This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 01:07:23 (UTC).

MULLEN, KEITH EUGENE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 MULLEN, KEITH EUGENE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0228

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MULLEN KIMBERLY

Decedent

MULLEN KEITH EUGENE

Not Classified By Court

SAMPSON VICTOR

SAMPSON VICTOR K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BROUSARD JILL ANNETTE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/15/2021: Minute Order

Ex Parte - Petition - [Drop Off] Ex Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of the Real Property Asset of the Estate Prior to Distribution

1/28/2021: Ex Parte - Petition - [Drop Off] Ex Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of the Real Property Asset of the Estate Prior to Distribution

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice of Ex Parte

1/28/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice of Ex Parte

Ex Parte - Order

2/1/2021: Ex Parte - Order

Notice - Waiver of Notice of Ex Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of the Real Property Asset of the Estate Prior to DistributionEx Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of th

2/8/2021: Notice - Waiver of Notice of Ex Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of the Real Property Asset of the Estate Prior to DistributionEx Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of th

Ex Parte - Petition - [Drop Off] Ex Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of the Real Property Asset of the Estate Prior to Distribution

2/8/2021: Ex Parte - Petition - [Drop Off] Ex Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of the Real Property Asset of the Estate Prior to Distribution

Ex Parte - Order

2/10/2021: Ex Parte - Order

Supplement - To First and Final Account

2/16/2021: Supplement - To First and Final Account

Minute Order

2/18/2021: Minute Order

Account - Final or Waiver - First And Final Account And Report, Final Distribution.

9/29/2020: Account - Final or Waiver - First And Final Account And Report, Final Distribution.

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing proof of mailing

10/7/2020: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing proof of mailing

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

5/13/2020: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Letters (Initial) - Administrator with limited authority

3/3/2020: Letters (Initial) - Administrator with limited authority

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

2/26/2020: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - Proposed Order

2/18/2020: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - Proposed Order

Supplement - 1st Supplement to Petition for Probate

2/7/2020: Supplement - 1st Supplement to Petition for Probate

Minute Order

2/10/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

1/21/2020: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSupplement (To First and Final Account ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition ([Drop Off] Ex Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of the Real Property Asset of the Estate Prior to Distribution ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (Waiver of Notice of Ex Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of the Real Property Asset of the Estate Prior to DistributionEx Parte Petition for Order Authorizing Encumbrance of the Real Property Asset of the Estate Prior to Distribution ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSupplement (1st Supplement to Petition for Probate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROUSARD JILL ANNETTE