This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 09:51:20 (UTC).

MUFG UNION BANK, N.A. VS MIRA CLEAN GLOBAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 MUFG UNION BANK, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MIRA CLEAN GLOBAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MEL RED RECANA and MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8718

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEL RED RECANA

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUFG UNION BANK N.A.

Defendants

KATAYAMA MASAYO

KATAYAMA YOSHITOMO AKA BUCKY KATAYAMA

MIRA CLEAN GLOBAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIBERI SANDRA I.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

3/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

12/28/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

12/27/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

12/27/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

12/27/2022: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

12/27/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATIONS FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDERS FOR WRITS OF ATTACHMENT

12/12/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATIONS FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDERS FOR WRITS OF ATTACHMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

12/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

9/13/2022: Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MARYBELLE COMPARAN IN SUPPORT

9/13/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MARYBELLE COMPARAN IN SUPPORT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

9/13/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

9/13/2022: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

9/13/2022: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MUFG Union Bank, N.A. on 09/02/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45 updated: Result Date to 03/07/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketStipulation - No Order STIPULATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT; Filed by: MUFG Union Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Mira Clean Global Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); Yoshitomo Katayama (Defendant); Masayo Katayama (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: MUFG Union Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAddress for Sandra I. Tiberi (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MUFG Union Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Mira Clean Global Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); Yoshitomo Katayama (Defendant); Masayo Katayama (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MUFG Union Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Mira Clean Global Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); Yoshitomo Katayama (Defendant); Masayo Katayama (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MUFG Union Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Mira Clean Global Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); Yoshitomo Katayama (Defendant); Masayo Katayama (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less