This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2019 at 18:56:27 (UTC).

MUBARAK MUBARAK VS KEVIN DEREK DEBRE

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 MUBARAK MUBARAK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEVIN DEREK DEBRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2424

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MUBARAK MUBARAK

Defendants and Respondents

DEBRE KEVIN DEREK

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CRUZ RAQUEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FORRESTER PERRY M. ESQ.

FORRESTER PERRY M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AS TO...)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AS TO...)

Motion re: - MOTION RE: TERMINATING SANCTIONS

11/14/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Notice of Ruling

10/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AS TO PLAINTIFF, ...)

10/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AS TO PLAINTIFF, ...)

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

8/29/2019: Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/1/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

7/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice of Ruling

7/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/30/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/31/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

5/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/28/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/23/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

ANSWER

5/30/2018: ANSWER

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/30/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

2/1/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

2/1/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (For Terminating Sanctions As to Plaintiff For His Failure To Comply With the Court's Order Compelling Him To Attend His Physical Examination;) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion For Terminating Sanctions As to...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketMotion for Terminating Sanctions (As to Plaintiff for His Failure to Comply with the Court's Order Compelling Him to Attend His Physical Examination); Filed by Kevin Derek Debre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Kevin Derek Debre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions (As To Plaintiff, Or In The Alternative For An Order Compelling Him To Attend His Physical Examination, Filed By Defendant) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions As To Plaintiff, ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketMotion for Terminating Sanctions (as to Plaintiff, or in the Alternative for an Order Compelling Him to Attend His Physical Examination); Filed by Kevin Derek Debre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Mubarak Mubarak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Kevin Derek Debre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kevin Derek Debre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Kevin Derek Debre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mubarak Mubarak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mubarak Mubarak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692424    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 2

Mubarak v. Debre

Defendant’s Motion for Terminating Sanctions as to Plaintiff for His Failure to Comply With the Court’s Order Compelling Him to Attend his Physical Examination is GRANTED. The action is ordered dismissed.

On 10/11/19, Defendant moved for terminating sanctions or alternatively for an order compelling Plaintiff to attend his physical examination. Plaintiff did not oppose the motion or appear at the hearing.

The court granted the alternative request and compelled Plaintiff to appear for his 11/11/19 examination. Defendant served notice of the court’s ruling on Plaintiff on 10/17/19, which included the order that Plaintiff appear for his examination. Motion, Ex. E. Plaintiff failed to appear. Declaration of Perry Forrester ¶ 10. Plaintiff has again not opposed this motion and has provided no excuse for his failure to appear.

Plaintiff had previously failed to appear at an earlier scheduled examination on 4/2/19. Id. ¶ 5.

Terminating and monetary sanctions are appropriate where there is outright refusal to comply with discovery obligations. Deyo v. Kilbourne, (1978) 84 Cal. App. 3d 771, 793. The failure to comply with a court’s order is discovery abuse for which terminating sanctions are warranted. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 2023.030(a)(d).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.