This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 06:36:00 (UTC).

MSNAR, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 MSNAR, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1392

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MSNAR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

LOS ANGELES CITY DEPARTMENT OF BUILDING AND SAFETY AN AGENCY OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Interested Party

BERDAN HOLDINGS LLC DELWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSHAN-ZAMIR PERRY

Defendant Attorney

FONG KENNETH TOM

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Writ of Mandate

5/3/2021: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

5/5/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

5/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Ruling

8/11/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 86 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by MSNAR, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by MSNAR, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MSNAR, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MSNAR, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by MSNAR, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERDEN HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FONG KENNETH TOM