Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2019 at 12:34:56 (UTC).

MSB, INC., ET AL. VS VOVA MARTIROSYAN

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 MSB, INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against VOVA MARTIROSYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0344

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MSB INC.

SHPOLYANSKY YAKOV

Respondent

MARTIROSYAN VOVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LENSKY ARTHUR L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES POTTER IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/6/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES POTTER IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DATE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DATE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/21/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

10/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

10/11/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/9/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE: DATE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE: DATE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/31/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Petition - PETITION PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND PROPOSED ORDER

7/31/2019: Petition - PETITION PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND PROPOSED ORDER

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/31/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MSB, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of James Potter in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by MSB, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference and Date of Hearing on Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by MSB, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Non-Opposition to Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by MSB, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MSB, Inc. (Petitioner); Yakov Shpolyansky (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance re: Date of Hearing on Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by MSB, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketPetition (Petition to Compel Arbitration and Proposed Order); Filed by MSB, Inc. (Petitioner); Yakov Shpolyansky (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENSKY ARTHUR