This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 04:53:11 (UTC).

MS SERVICES, LLC, A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS RAFAEL GALINDO

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 MS SERVICES, LLC, A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAFAEL GALINDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0553

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MS SERVICES LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

GALINDO RAFAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OLSON SHAWN M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/6/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/7/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MS Services, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MS Services, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MS Services, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MS Services, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MS Services, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MS Services, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MS SERVICES LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant