This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 04:09:02 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. VS VARDAN KYUNDIBEKYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VARDAN KYUNDIBEKYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0976

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS INC.

Defendant

KYUNDIBEKYAN AN INDIVIDUAL VARDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/8/2022: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

7/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/5/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/25/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/25/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT]

3/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT]

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/2/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Dismissal

3/2/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/2/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

3/2/2022: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/2/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

3/2/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 03/14/2022

3/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 03/14/2022

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/14/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

3/14/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

3/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

3/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

3/14/2022: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vardan Kyundibekyan, an individual (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vardan Kyundibekyan, an individual (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 2658.72; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 07/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vardan Kyundibekyan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vardan Kyundibekyan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketJudgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 03/15/2022 entered for Plaintiff Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. against Defendant Vardan Kyundibekyan, an individual. Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. against Defendant Vardan Kyundibekyan, an individual on the Complaint filed by Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. on 11/15/2021 for damages of $68,795.19, attorney fees of $2,265.90, interest of $12,072.36, and costs of $534.00 for a total of $83,667.45.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vardan Kyundibekyan, an individual (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAddress for RODOLFO GABA (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vardan Kyundibekyan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vardan Kyundibekyan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Vardan Kyundibekyan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Stewart in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less