This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2023 at 15:11:59 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. VS MAS PUBLISHING, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAS PUBLISHING, INC , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1302

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS INC.

Defendants

MAS PUBLISHING INC. A CORPORATION

TOVAR AN INDIVIDUAL MARIA I. AKA IRENE TOVAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO

Defendant Attorney

CABALLERO JOHN H

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/12/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

4/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/18/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/13/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

4/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT

4/5/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/3/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

2/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/7/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

2/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Order

5/12/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2024
  • Hearing02/05/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2023
  • Hearing11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/05/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49 updated: Result Date to 05/12/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Maria I. Tovar, an individual (Defendant); As to: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Maria I. Tovar, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAddress for RODOLFO GABA (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Management Conference: Result: Clerical Correction; As To Parties: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); Status changed from Filed to Rejected

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MAS Publishing, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Maria I. Tovar, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MAS Publishing, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Maria I. Tovar, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MAS Publishing, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Maria I. Tovar, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randolph M. Hammock in Department 49 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less