Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 11:35:12 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC VS CLARK STREET HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CLARK STREET HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0330

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS LLC

Defendants

CLARK STREET HOLDINGS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CA VENTURES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CA STUDENT LIVING BERKELEY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOE1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAULY ANDREW S

Defendant Attorney

TORAL TODD C.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/2/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

4/2/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/1/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND STIPULATION CONCERNING ELECTRONIC SERVICE UNDER RULE 2.251 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT AND CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1010.6

3/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND STIPULATION CONCERNING ELECTRONIC SERVICE UNDER RULE 2.251 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT AND CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1010.6

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • Hearing08/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by CLARK STREET HOLDINGS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); CA VENTURES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CLARK STREET HOLDINGS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); CA VENTURES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND STIPULATION CONCERNING ELECTRONIC SERVICE UNDER RULE 2.251 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT AND CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1010.6); Filed by MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MOUNTAIN PACIFIC OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAULY ANDREW STUART