This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 04:05:40 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN MEADOWS MASTER HOMEOWNERS VS MADRID FINANCIAL

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 MOUNTAIN MEADOWS MASTER HOMEOWNERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MADRID FINANCIAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DUKES, ROBERT A. and PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9567

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DUKES, ROBERT A.

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOUNTAIN MEADOWS MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOC

MOUNTAIN MEADOWS MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOC.

Defendants

MADRID FINANCIAL

MADRID FINANCIAL A NEVADA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHWARTZ JAMIE ESQ

BANKS STEVEN LLOYD ESQ

Defendant Attorney

NISSON PETER L. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/21/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/21/2017: Complaint

Summons

8/21/2017: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/24/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/31/2017: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

Summons

10/20/2017: Summons

Unknown

11/8/2017: Unknown

Answer

12/11/2017: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

12/11/2017: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/13/2017: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

12/13/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

1/2/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Mail

1/2/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Unknown

1/2/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/24/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/25/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/29/2018: Minute Order

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Request for Entry of Default/Default Judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Request for Entry of Default/Default ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Request for Entry of Default/Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Request for Entry of Default/Default ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Request for Entry of Default/Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Request for Entry of Default/Default ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MOUNTAIN MEADOWS MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Service of Defendant)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by MOUNTAIN MEADOWS MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketNtc of Change of Firm Name & Addr; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by MOUNTAIN MEADOWS MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MOUNTAIN MEADOWS MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MOUNTAIN MEADOWS MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9567    Hearing Date: January 22, 2020    Dept: O

Plaintiffs’ application for default judgment is DENIED without prejudice for the following reasons:

  1. Relief sought is not within amount of prayer of complaint or statement of damages. (Due Process; Greenup v. Rodman (1986) 42 Cal.3d 822, 824.) [PLAINTIFF EITHER NEEDS TO REQUEST JUDGMENT FOR THE $112,758.73 STATED IN THE COMPLAINT, OR FILE AND SERVE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTING THE AMOUNT TO REFLECT $182,517.14, AND RESUBMITTING ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT PACKET]



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNTAIN MEADOWS MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NISSON PETER L. ESQ