Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 01:00:10 (UTC).

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. VS SPIWAK AND IEZZA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against SPIWAK AND IEZZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0782

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC.

Defendants

IEZZA NICOLINO IRENIO AKA NICK IEZZA

SPIWAK AND IEZZA

MOSS KENNETH HOWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZASLAVSKY NEAL S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

2/25/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

2/25/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

4/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TERMINATION OR MODIFICATION OF THE STAY

1/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TERMINATION OR MODIFICATION OF THE STAY

Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/7/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

12/7/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/18/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/23/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

6/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/8/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Termination or Modification of the Stay); Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Stay of Proceedings); Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPIWAK AND IEZZA is a litigant

Latest cases where MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZASLAVSKY NEAL