This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2019 at 10:29:00 (UTC).

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. VS DIRK FIRMAN

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DIRK FIRMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9481

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC.

Defendants

FIRMAN DIRK

TRANSVIDEO TELEPRODUCTIONS

ADVANTAGE ADVERTISING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IEZZA NICK I.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/25/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Case Management Statement

11/15/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

12/3/2018: Minute Order

Other -

12/3/2018: Other -

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/3/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

12/3/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration

12/3/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/3/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

12/24/2018: Minute Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration

12/3/2018: Declaration

Judgment

12/3/2018: Judgment

Complaint

6/5/2017: Complaint

Summons

6/5/2018: Summons

Other -

6/5/2018: Other -

Legacy Document

7/19/2018: Legacy Document

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2018: Proof of Personal Service

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Notice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Minute Order ((Status Conference (legal file unavailable))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Other - (Case Summary); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Judgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/03/2018 entered for Plaintiff MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. against Defendant FIRMAN, DIRK.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Declaration (of Michael Levine); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Other - (Notice of Case Assignment); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IEZZA NICK I.