This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 21:00:28 (UTC).

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0548

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZASLAVSKY NEAL

Defendant Attorney

DALEY TODD ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES

9/15/2021: Order - ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

7/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

7/9/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/9/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/12/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

7/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER

7/12/2021: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER

Reply - REPLY BRIEF OF DEFENDANT A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/12/2021: Reply - REPLY BRIEF OF DEFENDANT A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/24/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TODD A. DALEY RE: COMPLIANCE WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY, INC.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

4/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TODD A. DALEY RE: COMPLIANCE WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY, INC.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/29/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOrder (Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Todd A. Daley Re: Compliance with Meet and Confer Requirement in Support of Defendant A-1 Electric Service Company, Inc.'s Demurrer to Complaint); Filed by A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where A-1 ELECTRIC SERVICE COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZASLAVSKY NEAL