This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 03:28:14 (UTC).

MOTE, PAMELA SUE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 MOTE, PAMELA SUE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6470

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JORDAN MICHAEL BENJAMIN

Decedent

MOTE PAMELA SUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GROSSMAN LESLIE KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) - Petition for Letters of Administration (Initial)

8/11/2020: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) - Petition for Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

8/17/2020: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

8/17/2020: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

8/28/2020: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial) (Petition for Letters of Administration (Initial) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSSMAN LESLIE KENNETH