This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 09:36:40 (UTC).

MOSHE MAGHBOULEH VS POUYAN BEDROOD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 MOSHE MAGHBOULEH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against POUYAN BEDROOD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1488

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGHBOULEH MOSHE

Defendants

BEDROOD POUYAN

TABARI SHEIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COLE MARSHALL RYAN

NIEDBALSKI NINA

Defendant Attorney

CHANGALA BROOK JOHN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 08/03/2023

8/3/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 08/03/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Continuance

6/22/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/16/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

6/13/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/7/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/7/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/06/2023

2/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/06/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/9/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/27/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

10/7/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2024
  • Hearing04/19/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department B at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/19/2024 at 09:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (Time Estimate 5-7 Days) scheduled for 04/29/2024 at 09:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference) of 08/03/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W updated: Result Date to 08/03/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Moshe Maghbouleh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Moshe Maghbouleh (Plaintiff); As to: Pouyan Bedrood (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/15/2022; Service Cost: 84.35; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Moshe Maghbouleh (Plaintiff); As to: Sheida Tabari (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/15/2022; Service Cost: 104.35; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Moshe Maghbouleh (Plaintiff); As to: Pouyan Bedrood (Defendant); Sheida Tabari (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Moshe Maghbouleh (Plaintiff); As to: Pouyan Bedrood (Defendant); Sheida Tabari (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Moshe Maghbouleh (Plaintiff); As to: Pouyan Bedrood (Defendant); Sheida Tabari (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Moshe Maghbouleh (Plaintiff); As to: Pouyan Bedrood (Defendant); Sheida Tabari (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less