This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2021 at 03:31:11 (UTC).

MOSES GEORGIAN VS CAL MED AMBULANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 MOSES GEORGIAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CAL MED AMBULANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0549

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGIAN MOSES

Defendant

CAL MED AMBULANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADAMS CHRISTOPHER A

JIVALAGIAN CASPAR S.

Defendant Attorneys

GATTAS MARTIN S

LUSSIER KEVIN R.

 

Court Documents

Joint Status Conference Report

11/30/2021: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT; FUR...)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT; FUR...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/6/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

5/10/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

2/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

3/1/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer - DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC. DBA CAL-MED AMBULANCE SERVICE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Answer - DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC. DBA CAL-MED AMBULANCE SERVICE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

10/26/2020: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

10/21/2020: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice of Appearance

10/9/2020: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/8/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Initial Status Conference Order

9/1/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

9/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 09/01/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

9/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 09/01/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • Hearing05/05/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Fur...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by Moses Georgian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Cal Med Ambulance Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Moses Georgian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 11:20 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 09/01/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Moses Georgian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Moses Georgian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUSSIER KEVIN RICHARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GATTAS, MARTIN S