Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:24:52 (UTC).

MOSAIC OWNERS ASSOCIATION ET AL VS PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 MOSAIC OWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL, ELIHU M. BERLE and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3469

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

ELIHU M. BERLE

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CHOI KENNETH

GUEVARRA BERNICE

JOSHI PUNIT

GUEVARRA BLANQUITA

KHAN JESSICA

JOSHI ADITI

MOSAIC OWNERS ASSOCIATION

SOLIS BRITTANY

SACAPANO MANUEL

KIM JEAN

SOLIS ALEX

LEE JAE KYUNG

ROW CAMILLA

SHIEH DONG-RU

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PULTE HOME CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 1000

WILLIAM M. PERKINS CO. INC.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ROES 1-500 INCLUSIVE

CHAMPION WINDOWS INC.

GSW FLOORING

WILLIAM M. PERKINS CO. INC.

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JACKSON LEE ESQ.

KURTZ CHRISTINA LEIN

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK LLP

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

COCHRAN SHANNON DEAVER

ANTES RYAN THOMAS

LETOFSKY LARRY D. ESQ.

SPRINGEL & FINK LLP

MURCHISON & CUMMING LAW OFFICES OF

GEORGGIN NICHOLAS A. ESQ.

MENEKSHE AYHAN M. ESQ.

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

LETOFSKY LARRY DAVID ESQ.

BERGER ABRAHAM

SHEN MICHAEL HSI-LIN

LOUIS LENA MARILEE

PARKS SCOTT GREGORY

MILLEA STEPHANIE L

MUNRO STEPHANIE MICHAELA

MCCLAIN ROBYN STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Other -

8/21/2018: Other -

Petition

5/3/2018: Petition

Demand for Jury Trial

1/10/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Stipulation and Order

1/3/2018: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Ruling

12/6/2017: Notice of Ruling

Request

11/9/2017: Request

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/27/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/27/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summons

10/6/2017: Summons

Demand for Jury Trial

10/6/2017: Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

10/10/2017: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons

10/11/2017: Summons

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF BUILDING STANDARDS AS SET FORTH IN CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 896 ;ETC

6/1/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF BUILDING STANDARDS AS SET FORTH IN CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 896 ;ETC

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

7/5/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Summons

8/8/2017: Summons

Answer

8/8/2017: Answer

Case Management Order

8/14/2017: Case Management Order

Summons

10/2/2017: Summons

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Pulte Home Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMessage Board Posting (Re: Notice of Continued Hearing of 7/24/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketPlaintiffs' Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by Mosaic Owners Association (Plaintiff); Kenneth Choi (Plaintiff); Bernice Guevarra (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketPlaintiffs and Pulte's Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by Moes 1 through 100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant); Moes 1 through 100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant); Moes 1 through 100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMessage Board Posting (re Notice of continued hearing for 4/15/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Posting Jury Fees); Filed by USA Corp (Cross-Defendant); Wilcox & Wilcox (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketPlaintiffs and Pulte's Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by Moes 1 through 100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant); Moes 1 through 100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant); Moes 1 through 100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
232 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) PROOF OF SERVICE FOR MINUTE ORDER ENTERED 6/09/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mosaic Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mosaic Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 309; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-06-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mosaic Owners Association (Plaintiff); Kenneth Choi (Plaintiff); Bernice Guevarra (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF BUILDING STANDARDS AS SET FORTH IN CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 896 ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILLIAM M PERKINS COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CHAMPION WINDOWS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Pulte Home Company, LLC, successor by conversion of Pulte Home Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robyn S McClain