This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 15:47:57 (UTC).

MORTEZA YAZDI VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 MORTEZA YAZDI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4972

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAZDI MORTEZA

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

5/6/2022: Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/5/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/5/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/5/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

5/5/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference (with Song-Beverly Act Joint Case Management Conference Statement Addendum and Attachment "A"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing ((Notice of Case Management Conference filed 05/05/2020 with Song-Beverly Act Joint Case Management Conference Statement Addendum and Attachment "A")); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Morteza Yazdi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Morteza Yazdi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Morteza Yazdi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR NORMAN F.