This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 11:17:52 (UTC).

MORISA KAPLAN VS CENTURY CITY MALL LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/29/2017 MORISA KAPLAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CENTURY CITY MALL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8616

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAPLAN MORISA

Defendants and Respondents

CENTURY CITY MALL LLC

WESTFIELD AMERICA INC

WESTFIELD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

DOES 1 TO 25

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

12/29/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE (PREMISES LIABILITY)

12/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE (PREMISES LIABILITY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MORISA KAPLAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE (PREMISES LIABILITY)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC688616    Hearing Date: January 31, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

On December 29, 2017, plaintiff Morisa Kaplan filed this action against defendant Century City Mall LLC for premises liability relating to a December 30, 2015 slip and fall. On July 1, 2019, Plaintiff failed to appear at the scheduled trial, and the Court dismissed the case. Plaintiff now seeks to set aside the July 1, 2019 dismissal under Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (b) on grounds that she did not know that the Court had set a trial date.

“The court may, upon any terms as may be just, relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him or her through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (b).) Application for this relief shall be made within a reasonable time, in no case exceeding six months, after judgment, dismissal, order, or proceeding was taken. (Ibid.) Plaintiff filed this motion within six months of dismissal and Defendants do not oppose it.

Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED and the action is reinstated. Trial is set for September 3, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 27 and the final status conference is set for August 20, 2020 at 10 a.m. in Department 27.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.