This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 04:07:41 (UTC).

MORILLO CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS FELDMAN & ASSOCIATES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 MORILLO CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against FELDMAN ASSOCIATES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0216

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORILLO CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendants

FELDMAN & ASSOCIATES INC.

FELDMAN MARK A.

FELDMAN & ASSOCIATES LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARKS PAUL

MARKS PAUL S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/30/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Morillo Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Morillo Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Morillo Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Morillo Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Morillo Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Feldman & Associates, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where MORILLO CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKS PAUL S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKS PAUL