Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 05:51:04 (UTC).

MORGAN ROBERTS VS. FREDERICK ROBERTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 MORGAN ROBERTS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FREDERICK ROBERTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3072

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROBERTS MORGAN

Defendants and Respondents

ROBERTS FREDERICK

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

STRICKLAND WILLIAM E. ESQ

STOLL MATTHEW C.

Defendant Attorney

COLMAN JONATHAN H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, FREDERICK ROBERTS

6/15/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, FREDERICK ROBERTS

Unknown

6/15/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, FREDERICK ROBERTS

6/15/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, FREDERICK ROBERTS

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, FREDERICK ROBERTS

6/15/2017: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, FREDERICK ROBERTS

Substitution of Attorney

4/5/2018: Substitution of Attorney

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED ANSWERS WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET NO. 2); ETC

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED ANSWERS WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET NO. 2); ETC

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING AND SHORTEN NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED ANSWERS WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET NO.2) AND

7/27/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING AND SHORTEN NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED ANSWERS WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET NO.2) AND

NOTICE OF RULING

7/30/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

8/27/2018: [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

ORDER RE:DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

9/11/2018: ORDER RE:DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

Minute Order

9/11/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF THE COURT'S RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

9/13/2018: NOTICE OF THE COURT'S RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Motion to Continue Trial Date

1/4/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Stipulation and Order

1/15/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

1/18/2019: Notice

Stipulation

3/14/2019: Stipulation

Stipulation and Order

3/25/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Ruling

3/26/2019: Notice of Ruling

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by FREDERICK ROBERTS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to vacate trial and final status conference dates and proposed order); Filed by FREDERICK ROBERTS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation to submit matter to binding arbitration); Filed by FREDERICK ROBERTS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Notice (DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO CONTINUE OFF CALENDAR); Filed by FREDERICK ROBERTS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, FREDERICK ROBERTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Answer; Filed by FREDERICK ROBERTS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by MORGAN ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MORGAN ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • at 08:32 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRICKLAND WILLIAM EDWARD