This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2021 at 22:59:13 (UTC).

MORGAN PICKS TWO, LLC VS A PLUS MAJESTIC INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 MORGAN PICKS TWO, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against A PLUS MAJESTIC INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9792

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ENRIQUEZ JESSE A. AKA JESSE ABLEARDO ENRIQUEZ

THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. A TENNESSEE CORPORATION

PERLSTEIN JUDITH E.

A PLUS MAJESTIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LOPEZ CARLOS

THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. FBO IRA JUDITH E. PERLSTEIN IRA 300394

THE ENTRUST GROUP INC.

ENRIQUEZ JESSE A. AKA JESS ABLEARDO ENRIQUEZ

SYNERGY INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

A PLUS MAJESTIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA APLUS MAJESTIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MARTINEZ ANDRES JR.

CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC.

A PLUS MAJESTIC INC. AKA APLUS MAJESTIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SYNERGY INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SYNERGY INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MARTINEZ ANDRES

CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC.

SYNERGY INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWAN BARRY RICHARD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

VESTERDAHL MATTHEW SCOT

MANNING MARIA

VIJAYRAGHAVAN VASU

CHAPPARS MIKE

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

VIJAYRAGHAVAN VASU

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

12/31/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Substitution of Attorney

10/26/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service - AMENDED

10/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service - AMENDED

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/22/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/9/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/2/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/16/2020: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Summons - 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

6/16/2020: Summons - 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRS IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL

6/30/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRS IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

7/9/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT J...)

7/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT J...)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/16/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER DEFENDANT THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. FBO IRA JUDITH E. PERLSTEIN IRA #00394S DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN 310 S. BREED STREET, LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90033

2/3/2020: Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER DEFENDANT THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. FBO IRA JUDITH E. PERLSTEIN IRA #00394S DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN 310 S. BREED STREET, LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90033

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/22/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/8/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/22/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • Hearing06/22/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Hearing06/22/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Default Prove Up Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Hearing06/06/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Hearing08/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Hearing02/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Hearing02/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default as to Cross-Defendant Synergy Investment Partners, LLC. and Andres Martinez, jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Hearing02/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Service as to Cross-Defendant Client Classifier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Andres Martinez, JR. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Morgan Picks Two, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Morgan Picks Two, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Morgan Picks Two, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Morgan Picks Two, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Morgan Picks Two, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Morgan Picks Two, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Morgan Picks Two, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Morgan Picks Two, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION FBO JAMES MARTIN CLARK ACCOUNT NUMBER 7230011412 is a litigant

Latest cases where A PLUS MAJESTIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant