Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 04:23:47 (UTC).

MORALES, TOMAS ARMANDO SALVADOR - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 MORALES, TOMAS ARMANDO SALVADOR - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7170

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORALES TOMAS ARMANDO SALVADOR

Not Classified By Court

MORALES SEBASTIAN ANTONIO SALVADOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MEINECKE PETER M.

 

Court Documents

Letters (Initial)

5/24/2021: Letters (Initial)

Letters (Initial)

5/24/2021: Letters (Initial)

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

5/20/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

5/10/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Order - Appointing Guardian - Person Only

5/11/2021: Order - Appointing Guardian - Person Only

Duties of Guardian

5/4/2021: Duties of Guardian

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

5/5/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Minute Order

4/29/2021: Minute Order

Proposed Order - Appointment of Guardian - Proposed Order

4/29/2021: Proposed Order - Appointment of Guardian - Proposed Order

Minute Order

4/29/2021: Minute Order

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

1/12/2021: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Minute Order

1/19/2021: Minute Order

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

8/31/2020: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

8/31/2020: Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

Order - Prescribing Notice

8/31/2020: Order - Prescribing Notice

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

8/31/2020: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Declaration - UCCJEA

8/31/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

8/31/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder - Eligibility for Special Immigrant Juvenile Status; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Guardian (Person Only ); Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDuties of Guardian; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Special Immigrant Juvenile Status Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) filed on August 31, 2020 by Tomas Armando Salvador Morales. )

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder - Prescribing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPetition - Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketConsent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketConsent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEINECKE PETER M.