This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 03:23:54 (UTC).

MORALES, DANIEL P. VS MORALES, IRMA

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 MORALES, DANIEL P filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MORALES, IRMA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3647

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORALES DANIEL P.

Respondent

MORALES IRMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PELAYO-GARCIA BEATRIZ A

Respondent Attorney

SANCHEZ DENNIS JOHN

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/2/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

4/2/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

5/4/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - UCCJEA

4/29/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

4/29/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - Income and Expense

4/29/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/29/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service of Summons

4/20/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

4/2/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

4/2/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

4/2/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/2/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

5/26/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Income and Expense

5/26/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Notice - of firm name change

9/13/2021: Notice - of firm name change

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

8/31/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

8/25/2021: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 87 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (of firm name change ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ DENNIS JOHN