This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 01:59:04 (UTC).

MORAD GOLCHEH ET AL VS KAMRAN KOHAN

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 MORAD GOLCHEH filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against KAMRAN KOHAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY J. FUJIE and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8671

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY J. FUJIE

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

1795 LB CAPITAL LLC

GOLCHEH DEVELOPMENTS AND INVESTMENTS LLC

K10 INVESTMENTS LLC

AZAD JACK DR.

GOLCHEH JOSHUA

CAREMARK PROPERTIES LLC

PROGRESSIVE REAL ESTATE INC.

GOLCHEH MORAD

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

KOHAN KAMRAN

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NEUFELD TIMOTHY L. ESQ.

GREEN GLENN RICHARD

Attorney at Green & Marker

1875 Century Park E Suite 1495

Los Angeles, CA 90067

RONICKHER MICHAEL JAMES

Attorney at Constantine Cannon LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave Nw Ste 1300N

Washington, DC 20004

NEUFELD TIMOTHY LEE ESQ.

Attorney at Neufeld Marks

315 W 9Th St Suite 501

Los Angeles, CA 90015

GREEN GLENN RICHARD ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COSTELL & CORNELIUS LAW CORPORATION

COHANGHADOSH JUSTIN

Attorney at Costell & Cornelius Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Ave. Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1007

COHANGHADOSH JUSTIN ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

COHANGHADOSH JUSTIN

Attorney at Costell & Cornelius Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Ave. Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1007

COHANGHADOSH JUSTIN ESQ.

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

GREEN GLENN RICHARD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

Unknown

1/7/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

1/7/2019: Minute Order

Request for Refund / Order

9/27/2018: Request for Refund / Order

Cross-Complaint

10/5/2018: Cross-Complaint

Substitution of Attorney

10/23/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

10/23/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

10/23/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

11/13/2018: Minute Order

Complaint

10/30/2018: Complaint

DEFENDANT KAMRAN KOHAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ETC.

9/27/2018: DEFENDANT KAMRAN KOHAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ETC.

PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO OPUS BANK

9/11/2018: PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO OPUS BANK

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO BRC ADVISORS, INC.; ETC.

9/11/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO BRC ADVISORS, INC.; ETC.

Minute Order

8/31/2018: Minute Order

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

6/5/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

SUMMONS

6/4/2018: SUMMONS

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Kamran Kohan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Reply (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JUSTIN COHANGHADOSH); Filed by Kamran Kohan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Reply (DEFENDANT KAMRAN KOHAN?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 128.7; DEC OF JUSTIN COHANGHADOSH); Filed by Kamran Kohan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Opposition (to Motion for Sanctions); Filed by 1795 LB Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); Jack, DR. Azad (Plaintiff); Caremark Properties LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Opposition (-Non to Motion to Strike); Filed by 1795 LB Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); Jack, DR. Azad (Plaintiff); Caremark Properties LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • at 09:53 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/07/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Morad Golcheh (Plaintiff); Joshua Golcheh (Plaintiff); Jack, DR. Azad (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Morad Golcheh (Plaintiff); Joshua Golcheh (Plaintiff); Jack, DR. Azad (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD ETC....

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Real Estate Solutions PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLCHEH DEVELOPMENT AND INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHANGHADOSH JUSTIN