This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 22:07:31 (UTC).

MOOSA NAIM, ET AL. VS VISTA GENERAL ENGINEERING COMPANY INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 MOOSA NAIM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VISTA GENERAL ENGINEERING COMPANY INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6264

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAIM MOOSA

NAIM LAURA

Cross Defendants and Defendants

ELITE WATERPROOFING AND COATING INC.

CASILLIAS JORGE

FRIAS ANDREZ

GOULD ELIO

SAUNDERS SCOTT

VISTA GENERAL ENGINEERING COMPANY INC.

MOES 1 THROUGH 50

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CASILLIAS JORGE

VISTA GENERAL ENGINEERING COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY CLIFFORD N

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CAMPBELL NICK

HILBERG SCOTT B.

LUCAS TIMOTHY D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/27/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES JORGE CASILLAS

9/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES JORGE CASILLAS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/31/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

8/24/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

8/24/2021: Cross-Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

8/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

8/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

8/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/25/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

8/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

8/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Answer

8/25/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

8/26/2021: Cross-Complaint

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • Hearing01/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Hearing12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Hearing06/01/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Moosa Naim (Plaintiff); Laura Naim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (JORGE CASILLAS); Filed by Jorge Casillas Erroneously Sued As Jorge Casillias (Defendant); Andrez Frias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Moosa Naim (Plaintiff); Laura Naim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Vista General Engineering Company Inc. (Defendant); Scott Saunders (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by Moosa Naim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Vista General Engineering Company Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Moosa Naim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Moosa Naim (Plaintiff); Laura Naim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Moosa Naim (Plaintiff); Laura Naim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Moosa Naim (Plaintiff); Laura Naim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Moosa Naim (Plaintiff); Laura Naim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Moosa Naim (Plaintiff); Laura Naim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Moosa Naim (Plaintiff); Laura Naim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELITE WATERPROOFING AND COATINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VISTA GENERAL ENGINEERING COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRY CLIFFORD E