Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 14:41:12 (UTC).

MOORE, SHANNON - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 MOORE, SHANNON - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1475

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YOUNG DIANE

Not Classified By Court

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NEZHAD MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

5/3/2021: Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

Minute Order

5/18/2021: Minute Order

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

3/8/2021: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

3/8/2021: Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

2/18/2021: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

2/18/2021: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketReceipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Deposit Funds Expedited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDISP: Expedited Minor's Compromise Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEZHAD MATTHEW B.