Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 13:07:53 (UTC).

MONSTER MORTGAGE VS DELNAZ SHERVANLOO

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 MONSTER MORTGAGE filed an Other lawsuit against DELNAZ SHERVANLOO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0723

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONSTER MORTGAGE DBA SCORE PROPERTIES

Defendant

SHERVANLOO DELNAZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

Defendant Attorney

NUSSBAUM LANE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/22/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Amended Complaint

4/30/2021: Amended Complaint

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/13/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/20/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

4/20/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (DELNAZ SHERVANLOO)

4/21/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (DELNAZ SHERVANLOO)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

4/21/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • Hearing10/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Hearing07/09/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Delnaz Shervanloo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Monster Mortgage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Monster Mortgage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Monster Mortgage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Delnaz Shervanloo)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Monster Mortgage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Monster Mortgage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Monster Mortgage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Monster Mortgage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONSTER MORTGAGE DBA SCORE PORPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NUSSBAUM LANE