Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2021 at 02:09:43 (UTC).

MONROVIA-MYRTLE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CALASIA CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 MONROVIA-MYRTLE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against CALASIA CONSTRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0059

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONROVIA-MYRTLE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ESPANA DIANA

CALASIA CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ESPANA EDGAR D

CDO MONROVIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEG ADAM MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/20/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/20/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • Hearing06/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Hearing04/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MONROVIA-MYRTLE, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MONROVIA-MYRTLE, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MONROVIA-MYRTLE, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALASIA CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MONROVIA-MYRTLE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEG ADAM