This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 03:12:00 (UTC).

MONIQUE MACKEY VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 MONIQUE MACKEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6842

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACKEY MONIQUE

Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPOR-

LA RONDA STEVENSON DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STEINER NEIL S. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DE BLANC ALBERT ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

9/22/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

9/22/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MONIQUE MACKEY'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/14/2017: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MONIQUE MACKEY'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

11/14/2017: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

2/21/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

DEFENDANT LARONDA STEVENSON'S, EMPLOYEE OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MONIQUE MACKEY'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC

3/27/2018: DEFENDANT LARONDA STEVENSON'S, EMPLOYEE OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MONIQUE MACKEY'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC

AMENDFD NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

3/19/2018: AMENDFD NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/28/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (-FSC:6-11-19 Trial 6-25-19); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Monique Mackey (Plaintiff); Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant); La Ronda Stevenson (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT LARONDA STEVENSON'S, EMPLOYEE OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MONIQUE MACKEY'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketAMENDFD NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Monique Mackey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Monique Mackey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MONIQUE MACKEY'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Monique Mackey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Monique Mackey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6842    Hearing Date: June 24, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

monique mackey,

Plaintiff,

v.

los angeles county mta,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****6842

Hearing Date: June 24, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Attorney Neil Steiner (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Monqiue Mackey (“Plaintiff”). Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. That is a valid basis for withdrawal.

Counsel should note that the order will become effective upon the filing of proof of service of a signed copy of the updated the order on Plaintiff. Counsel will remain attorney of record until Counsel files with the Court proof of service of the signed order. Counsel must serve a copy of the signed order (form MC-053) on Plaintiff within 10 days.

The Court intends to set the following dates:

Final Status Conference: January 13, 2021, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: January 27, 2021, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on the new trial date. Counsel shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: June 24, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: ****6842    Hearing Date: March 17, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

monique mackey,

Plaintiff,

v.

los angeles county mta,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****6842

Hearing Date: March 17, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Attorney Neil Steiner (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Monqiue Mackey (“Plaintiff”). Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. That is a valid basis for withdrawal.

Counsel should note that the order will become effective upon the filing of proof of service of a signed copy of the updated the order on Plaintiff. Counsel will remain attorney of record until Counsel files with the Court proof of service of the signed order. Counsel must serve a copy of the signed order (form MC-053) on Plaintiff within 10 days.

The Court intends to set the following dates:

Final Status Conference: January 13, 2021, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: January 27, 2021, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on the new trial date. Counsel shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: March 17, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE BLANC ALBERT ESQ.