Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2020 at 05:24:11 (UTC).

MONIKA WILGA ET AL VS AMERICAN UNIVERSITY PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 MONIKA WILGA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN UNIVERSITY PREPARATORY SCHOOL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3085

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Guardian Ad Litems and Cross Defendants

WILGA MONIKA

ANNOTTI REGINA DBA MARGAUX MODELS LLC

MARGAUX MODELS LLC

PHAM LESLIE

ANNOTTI REGINA

CLAUSON LARRY DBA MARGAUX MODELS LLC

CLAUSON LARRY MARGAUX MODELS LLC

TODD DAVID DBA DT MODEL MANAGEMENT

CLAUSON LARRY DBA MARGAUX MODELS LLC.

CLAUSON LARRY

ANNOTTI REGINA DBA MARGAUX MODELS LLC.

TODD DAVID DBA DTA AGENCY LLC

SILVA WILLIAM J

SILVA WILLIAM J DBA BILL SILVA MANGEMENT INC.

PHAM LESLIE DBA DT MODEL MANAGEMENT LLC

PHAM LESLIE DBA DT MODEL MANGEMENT LLC

PHAM LESLIE DBA DT MODEL MANAGEMENT

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 THROUGH 15

AMERICAN UNIVERSITY PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Minor

STAJSZCZAK NIKOLA MONIKA

Cross Defendant and Not Classified By Court

MARGAUX MODELS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorney

RYAN MICHAEL J. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

EWING VINCENT C.

EWING VINCENT CARLTON ESQ.

CORRIEA BETH D.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

EWING VINCENT CARLTON ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

MONARCH JENNIFER ROSE

GOLDSMITH ANDREW

ROTHSCHILD STEPHEN D.

RYAN MICHAEL JAMES ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/23/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

PLAINTIFF MONIKA WILGA'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES FROM AUP TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, SET ONE AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS IN THE AMOU

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFF MONIKA WILGA'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES FROM AUP TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, SET ONE AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS IN THE AMOU

JOINT WITNESS LIST

8/1/2018: JOINT WITNESS LIST

PLAINTIFFS MONIKA WILCA AND NIKOLA STAJSZCZAK?S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 TO EXCLUDE USE OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF SUNNY LEE AND JASON KWON; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J.

8/29/2018: PLAINTIFFS MONIKA WILCA AND NIKOLA STAJSZCZAK?S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 TO EXCLUDE USE OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF SUNNY LEE AND JASON KWON; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J.

Cross-Complaint

1/22/2019: Cross-Complaint

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

3/4/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

8/30/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Motion for Protective Order

9/4/2019: Motion for Protective Order

Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AMERICAN UNIVERSITY PREPARATORY SCHOOL

2/10/2020: Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AMERICAN UNIVERSITY PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Order - Dismissal

2/13/2020: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

11/6/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order -

6/12/2018: Minute Order -

JURY INSTRUCTIONS

8/1/2018: JURY INSTRUCTIONS

PLAINTIFFS MONIKA WILGA AND NIKOLA STAJSZCZAK'S MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT ADAM GREEN FROM CERTAIN TESTIMONY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. RYAN; [PROPOSED

8/1/2018: PLAINTIFFS MONIKA WILGA AND NIKOLA STAJSZCZAK'S MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT ADAM GREEN FROM CERTAIN TESTIMONY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. RYAN; [PROPOSED

Minute Order -

8/13/2018: Minute Order -

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) (RES...)

3/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) (RES...)

181 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • Hearing07/28/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Hearing07/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Hearing03/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Monika Wilga (Plaintiff); Nikola Monika Stajszczak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 54, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Short Continuance of Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Short Continuance of Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
322 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketDECLARATIONS OF MICHAEL J. RYAN AND JAMAICA ROSE WAKEFIELD RE INABILITY TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Monika Wilga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICEOF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AN ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Monika Wilga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC673085    Hearing Date: April 1, 2021    Dept: 52

Tentative Ruling:

Vincent C. Ewing’s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant American University Preparatory School

The court having read the papers and there being no opposition rules as follows:

CCP § 284 provides:

The attorney in an action or special proceeding may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination, as follows:

1. Upon the consent of both client and attorney, filed with the clerk, or entered upon the minutes;

2. Upon the order of the court, upon the application of either client or attorney, after notice from one to the other.

California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(c) provides that a motion to be relieved as counsel must include a declaration explaining why the attorney is filing a motion under § 284(2) instead of filing a consent under § 284(1).

Rather than explain why this motion is necessary, counsel’s declaration states that both attorney and client consent and that defendant already found new counsel and will file a substitution of attorney. (Decl., Attachment 2.) Defendant has not filed a substitution of attorney. Counsel’s declaration does not suffice as “the consent of both client and attorney, filed with the clerk, or entered upon the minutes.” The Judicial Council adopted form MC-050, Substitution of Attorney—Civil, for mandatory use as the method of filing written consent with the clerk under CCP § 284(1).

The motion is DENIED without prejudice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MICHAEL J. ESQ.