Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 17:41:39 (UTC).

MONICA STOBO, ET AL. VS BRUNSWICK BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 MONICA STOBO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRUNSWICK BUILDERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0409

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

STOBO MONICA

STOBO ROBERT

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

FORBES STEVEN JOHN

D & D PLASTERING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROJAS DARIO EDMUNDO DBA ON SITE CONSTRUCTION

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

BIRAL DANIEL DBA D F T P PLUMBING

ONSITE CONSTRUCTON UNLIMITED INC.

OVERHEAD DOOR & FIRESIDE EXPERTS INC.

DTFP INC.

RADLEIN LLOYD LLEWELLYNE DBA RADLEIN FINE HOME BUILDER

AVEM ROOFING SHEET METAL WATERPROOFINGINC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BANUELOS DANIEL DBA DB WRITING

R.C. BUSH INC

CORTEZ ALDOLFO

STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

EDJE-ENTERPRISES!

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

IBROX ELECTRIC INC

STOBO MONICA

STOBO ROBERT

59 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CAMERON CLARK HOWARD

SMIGLIANI PAUL WILLIAM

SOSA CARLOS

PENDLETON MELODY RUSSELL

SOBEL STEVEN ALAN

YAHYAI ARASH

CAMPBELL NICHELO

MARKS GREGORY W

ROBERTS PATRICK MATTHEW

JEFFERY MONA

LAGMAN-LEGASPI CATHERINE CLAIRE

BERGSTEN ROBERT T.

HINOJOS E. BENJAMIN

KIM AMBER NICOLE

MCMAHON TIMOTHY

COUNTS EMAHN

KENNEDY KEVIN P

CALIN SANDRA

GORDON GREGORY H

LEWIN RODNEY THEODORE

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTS PATRICK MATTHEW

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

CAMPBELL NICHELO

MARKS GREGORY W

ROBERTS PATRICK MATTHEW

JEFFERY MONA

LAGMAN-LEGASPI CATHERINE CLAIRE

COUNTS EMAHN

CALIN SANDRA

GORDON GREGORY H

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RE-NAME AS DOE AND ORDER THEREON

5/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RE-NAME AS DOE AND ORDER THEREON

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL;)

5/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL;)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT REJECTED

12/12/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT REJECTED

Case Management Statement

7/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/3/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

6/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Answer

5/6/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

1/25/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Case Management Statement

1/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

1/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

1/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

279 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • Hearing08/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Hearing08/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: Striking Avem Roofing's Answer for Failure to Retain Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by L.A. Overhead Door Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Filed by Ibrox Electric Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Ibrox Electric Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RE-NAME AS DOE AND ORDER THEREON); Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Conference ((Telephonic) ReStipulation and Order to Dismiss Suretec Indemnity Company) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
288 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff); Gerard B. Annibali Drywall Company Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Monica Stobo (Plaintiff); Robert Stobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDJE-ENTERPRISES! is a litigant

Latest cases where OVERHEAD DOOR & FIRESIDE EXPERTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where D & D PLASTERING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant