This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 15:38:51 (UTC).

MONICA ROJAS VS WINCO FOODS, LLC,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 MONICA ROJAS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against WINCO FOODS, LLC,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3892

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROJAS MONICA

Defendants

FLOOR WORKS LLC

THE MATWORKS COMPANY LLC

WINCO FOODS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CURRAN ALICIA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/25/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

7/25/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/25/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2024
  • Hearing07/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2024
  • Hearing01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Monica Rojas (Plaintiff); As to: WINCO FOODS, LLC, (Defendant); THE MATWORKS COMPANY, LLC (Defendant); FLOOR WORKS, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Monica Rojas (Plaintiff); As to: WINCO FOODS, LLC, (Defendant); THE MATWORKS COMPANY, LLC (Defendant); FLOOR WORKS, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MATWORKS COMPANY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WINCO FOODS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURRAN, ALICIA S