Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2021 at 14:06:56 (UTC).

MONICA MALDONADO VS 900 VERMONT, LLC; A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 MONICA MALDONADO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 900 VERMONT, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0829

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALDONADO MONICA

Defendants

CRAIG LAWSON & CO. LLC; A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

900 VERMONT HOLDINGS LP; A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

900 VERMONT LLC; A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LARIN MICHAEL J.

Other Attorneys

REYES JORGE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED (MISSING DECLARATION CONCERNING WAIVED COURT FEES)

5/14/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED (MISSING DECLARATION CONCERNING WAIVED COURT FEES)

Answer

5/7/2021: Answer

Answer

5/7/2021: Answer

Answer

5/7/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

4/2/2021: PI General Order

Complaint

3/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/22/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2024
  • Hearing03/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Monica Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Not Entered (Missing Declaration Concerning Waived Court Fees)); Filed by Monica Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CRAIG LAWSON & CO., LLC; a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 900 VERMONT HOLDINGS, LP; a California limited partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 900 VERMONT, LLC; a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Monica Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Monica Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Monica Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Monica Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Monica Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Monica Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Monica Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Monica Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRAIG LAWSON & CO. LLC; A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYES JORGE H.