Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 03:55:07 (UTC).

MONICA GIOIA VS SUPER STAR LIQUOR, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 MONICA GIOIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUPER STAR LIQUOR, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9531

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIOIA MONICA

Defendant

SUPER STAR LIQUOR INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

NGUYEN MINH T.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/2/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

12/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/29/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Hearing06/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MONICA GIOIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice Of Address For Electronic Service); Filed by MONICA GIOIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MONICA GIOIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MONICA GIOIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MONICA GIOIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NGUYEN MINH T.