This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2023 at 04:02:23 (UTC).

MONICA FRYER VS MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 MONICA FRYER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0146

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRYER MONICA

Defendants

COURTYARD BY MARRIOTT SANTA CLARITA VALENCIA

ELHELOU ALISSA

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/18/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/18/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/12/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2023
  • Hearing08/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F51 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F51 - Hon. Andrew E. Coopereffective 04/17/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F51 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MONICA FRYER (Plaintiff); As to: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); COURTYARD BY MARRIOTT SANTA CLARITA VALENCIA (Defendant); ALISSA ELHELOU (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MONICA FRYER (Plaintiff); As to: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); COURTYARD BY MARRIOTT SANTA CLARITA VALENCIA (Defendant); ALISSA ELHELOU (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MONICA FRYER (Plaintiff); As to: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); COURTYARD BY MARRIOTT SANTA CLARITA VALENCIA (Defendant); ALISSA ELHELOU (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less